Minnesota 2023 2023-2024 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF10 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/06/2023

                    1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to labor and industry; providing for use of skilled and trained contractor​
1.3 workforces at petroleum refineries; amending Minnesota Statutes 2022, section​
1.4 177.27, subdivision 4; proposing coding for new law in Minnesota Statutes, chapter​
1.5 181.​
1.6BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.7 Section 1. Minnesota Statutes 2022, section 177.27, subdivision 4, is amended to read:​
1.8 Subd. 4.Compliance orders.The commissioner may issue an order requiring an​
1.9employer to comply with sections 177.21 to 177.435, 181.02, 181.03, 181.031, 181.032,​
1.10181.101, 181.11, 181.13, 181.14, 181.145, 181.15, 181.172, paragraph (a) or (d), 181.275,​
1.11subdivision 2a, 181.722, 181.79, and 181.939 to 181.943, and 181.987, or with any rule​
1.12promulgated under section 177.28. The commissioner shall issue an order requiring an​
1.13employer to comply with sections 177.41 to 177.435 or 181.987 if the violation is repeated.​
1.14For purposes of this subdivision only, a violation is repeated if at any time during the two​
1.15years that preceded the date of violation, the commissioner issued an order to the employer​
1.16for violation of sections 177.41 to 177.435 or 181.987 and the order is final or the​
1.17commissioner and the employer have entered into a settlement agreement that required the​
1.18employer to pay back wages that were required by sections 177.41 to 177.435. The​
1.19department shall serve the order upon the employer or the employer's authorized​
1.20representative in person or by certified mail at the employer's place of business. An employer​
1.21who wishes to contest the order must file written notice of objection to the order with the​
1.22commissioner within 15 calendar days after being served with the order. A contested case​
1.23proceeding must then be held in accordance with sections 14.57 to 14.69. If, within 15​
1​Section 1.​
S0010-2 2nd Engrossment​SF10 REVISOR SS​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 10​NINETY-THIRD SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: SEEBERGER, Dziedzic, Klein, McEwen and Abeler)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​72​01/04/2023​
Referred to Labor​
Author added Klein​127​01/10/2023​
Authors added McEwen; Abeler​181​01/12/2023​
Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety​190a​01/17/2023​
Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee​190​
Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Labor​03/06/2023​ 2.1calendar days after being served with the order, the employer fails to file a written notice​
2.2of objection with the commissioner, the order becomes a final order of the commissioner.​
2.3 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective October 15, 2023.​
2.4 Sec. 2. [181.987] USE OF SKILLED AND TRAINED CONTRACTOR​
2.5WORKFORCES AT PETROLEUM REFINERIES.​
2.6 Subdivision 1.Definitions.(a) For purposes of this section, the following terms have​
2.7the meanings given.​
2.8 (b) "Contractor" means a vendor that enters into or seeks to enter into a contract with​
2.9an owner or operator of a petroleum refinery to perform construction, alteration, demolition,​
2.10installation, repair, maintenance, or hazardous material handling work at the site of the​
2.11petroleum refinery. Contractor includes all contractors or subcontractors of any tier​
2.12performing work as described in this paragraph at the site of the petroleum refinery.​
2.13Contractor does not include employees of the owner or operator of a petroleum refinery.​
2.14 (c) "Registered apprenticeship program" means an apprenticeship program registered​
2.15with the Department of Labor and Industry under chapter 178 or with the United States​
2.16Department of Labor Office of Apprenticeship or a recognized state apprenticeship agency​
2.17under Code of Federal Regulations, title 29, parts 29 and 30.​
2.18 (d) "Skilled and trained workforce" means a workforce in which each employee of the​
2.19contractor or subcontractor of any tier working at the site of the petroleum refinery meets​
2.20one of the following criteria:​
2.21 (1) is currently registered as an apprentice in a registered apprenticeship program in the​
2.22applicable trade;​
2.23 (2) has graduated from a registered apprenticeship program in the applicable trade; or​
2.24 (3) has completed all of the related instruction and on-the-job learning requirements​
2.25needed to graduate from the registered apprenticeship program their employer participates​
2.26in.​
2.27 (e) "Petroleum refinery" means a facility engaged in producing gasoline, kerosene,​
2.28distillate fuel oils, residual fuel oil, lubricants, or other products through distillation of​
2.29petroleum or through redistillation, cracking, or reforming of unfinished petroleum​
2.30derivatives. Petroleum refinery includes fluid catalytic cracking unit catalyst regenerators,​
2.31fluid catalytic cracking unit incinerator-waste heat boilers, fuel gas combustion devices,​
2.32and indirect heating equipment associated with the refinery.​
2​Sec. 2.​
S0010-2 2nd Engrossment​SF10 REVISOR SS​ 3.1 (f) "OEM" means original equipment manufacturer and refers to organizations that​
3.2manufacture or fabricate equipment for sale directly to purchasers or other resellers.​
3.3 Subd. 2.Use of contractors by owner, operator; requirement.(a) An owner or operator​
3.4of a petroleum refinery shall, when contracting with contractors for the performance of​
3.5construction, alteration, demolition, installation, repair, maintenance, or hazardous material​
3.6handling work at the site of the petroleum refinery, require that the contractors performing​
3.7that work, and any subcontractors of any tier, use a skilled and trained workforce when​
3.8performing all work at the site of the petroleum refinery.​
3.9 (b) The requirement under this subdivision applies only when each contractor and​
3.10subcontractor of any tier is performing work at the site of the petroleum refinery.​
3.11 (c) The requirement under this subdivision does not apply when an owner or operator​
3.12contracts with contractors or subcontractors hired to perform OEM work to comply with​
3.13equipment warranty requirements.​
3.14 (d) An owner or operator's contracted workforce must meet the requirements of​
3.15subdivision 1, paragraph (d) according to the following schedule:​
3.16 (1) 65 percent by October 15, 2023;​
3.17 (2) 75 percent by October 15, 2024; and​
3.18 (3) 85 percent by October 15, 2025.​
3.19 Subd. 3.Penalties.(a) The Division of Labor Standards shall receive complaints of​
3.20violations of this section. The commissioner of labor and industry shall fine an owner or​
3.21operator, contractor, or subcontractor of any tier not less than $5,000 nor more than $10,000​
3.22for each violation of the requirements in this section.​
3.23 (b) An owner or operator shall be found in violation of this section, and subject to fines​
3.24and other penalties, for failing to:​
3.25 (1) require a skilled and trained workforce in its contracts and subcontracts as required​
3.26by subdivision 2, paragraph (a); or​
3.27 (2) enforce the requirement of use of a skilled and trained workforce as required by​
3.28subdivision 2, paragraph (a).​
3.29 (c) A contractor or subcontractor shall be found in violation of this section, and subject​
3.30to fines and other penalties, if the contractor or subcontractor fails to use a skilled and trained​
3.31workforce as required by subdivision 2, paragraph (a).​
3​Sec. 2.​
S0010-2 2nd Engrossment​SF10 REVISOR SS​ 4.1 (d) Each shift on which a violation of this section occurs shall be considered a separate​
4.2violation. This fine is in addition to any penalties provided under section 177.27, subdivision​
4.37. In determining the amount of a fine under this subdivision, the appropriateness of the​
4.4fine to the size of the violator's business and the gravity of the violation shall be considered.​
4.5 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective October 15, 2023.​
4​Sec. 2.​
S0010-2 2nd Engrossment​SF10 REVISOR SS​