Senate | 03/27/2023 | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Comm report: To pass and re-referred to State and Local Government and Veterans | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Withdrawn and re-referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Author added Hoffman | ||
Senate | 01/27/2023 | Author added Fateh | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Withdrawn and re-referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Author added Boldon | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | Referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 01/11/2023 | Introduction and first reading |