Senate | 05/03/2023 | Author added Marty | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | Withdrawn and re-referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Judiciary and Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Author added Kupec | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Labor | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Referred to State and Local Government and Veterans | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Introduction and first reading |