House | 02/24/2025 | Authors added Gillman and Sexton | ||
House | 02/20/2025 | Author added Altendorf | ||
House | 02/17/2025 | Authors added Koznick and Schwartz | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Authors added McDonald and Rymer | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Authors added Schultz; Duran; Zeleznikar; Knudsen; Bennett; Anderson, P. H.; Jacob; Burkel; Harder; Allen; Backer; Niska; Gordon and Warwas | ||
House | 02/06/2025 | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |