1 | 1 | | 1.1 A bill for an act |
---|
2 | 2 | | 1.2 relating to transportation; establishing a qualification-based selection requirement |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1.3 for certain projects at the Department of Transportation; requiring reports; |
---|
4 | 4 | | 1.4 appropriating money. |
---|
5 | 5 | | 1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA: |
---|
6 | 6 | | 1.6 Section 1. QUALIFICATION-BASED SELECTION FOR ENGINEERING |
---|
7 | 7 | | 1.7SERVICES PILOT PROGRAM. |
---|
8 | 8 | | 1.8 Subdivision 1.Definitions.(a) For purposes of this section, the following terms have |
---|
9 | 9 | | 1.9the meanings given. |
---|
10 | 10 | | 1.10 (b) "Best value" has the meaning given in Minnesota Statutes, section 16C.28, subdivision |
---|
11 | 11 | | 1.111b. |
---|
12 | 12 | | 1.12 (c) "Commissioner" means the commissioner of transportation. |
---|
13 | 13 | | 1.13 (d) "Contractual threshold" means a project with consultant fees for engineering services |
---|
14 | 14 | | 1.14in excess of $800,000 per project year. |
---|
15 | 15 | | 1.15 (e) "Project" means an uncompleted road construction project where qualification-based |
---|
16 | 16 | | 1.16selection services are utilized. |
---|
17 | 17 | | 1.17 (f) "Qualification-based selection" has the meaning given in Minnesota Statutes, section |
---|
18 | 18 | | 1.1816C.087, subdivision 2. |
---|
19 | 19 | | 1.19 Subd. 2.Establishment.From October 1, 2025, to March 1, 2028, the commissioner |
---|
20 | 20 | | 1.20must use qualification-based selection methods to determine the selection of engineering |
---|
21 | 21 | | 1.21and design professionals on five or more projects in each year meeting the contractual |
---|
22 | 22 | | 1.22threshold. The commissioner may use qualification-based selection methods across different |
---|
23 | 23 | | 1Section 1. |
---|
24 | 24 | | REVISOR KRB/AC 25-0467203/10/25 |
---|
25 | 25 | | State of Minnesota |
---|
26 | 26 | | This Document can be made available |
---|
27 | 27 | | in alternative formats upon request |
---|
28 | 28 | | HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
29 | 29 | | H. F. No. 2759 |
---|
30 | 30 | | NINETY-FOURTH SESSION |
---|
31 | 31 | | Authored by Koegel and Koznick03/24/2025 |
---|
32 | 32 | | The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on Transportation Finance and Policy 2.1phases of an eligible project, including predesign, design, construction, and reconstruction. |
---|
33 | 33 | | 2.2In selecting which five projects per year are subject to qualification-based selection, the |
---|
34 | 34 | | 2.3commissioner must not use the same project or same phase of a project in a subsequent |
---|
35 | 35 | | 2.4year. |
---|
36 | 36 | | 2.5 Subd. 3.Preliminary report.By October 1, 2026, the commissioner must submit a |
---|
37 | 37 | | 2.6preliminary report to the chairs and ranking minority members of the legislative committees |
---|
38 | 38 | | 2.7with jurisdiction over transportation finance and policy. The report must contain information |
---|
39 | 39 | | 2.8on the use of qualification-based selection methods by the Department of Transportation |
---|
40 | 40 | | 2.9for certain road construction projects, including: |
---|
41 | 41 | | 2.10 (1) a preliminary evaluation of the use of qualification-based selection methods; |
---|
42 | 42 | | 2.11 (2) the development of criteria to determine eligible projects for which qualification-based |
---|
43 | 43 | | 2.12selection is used; |
---|
44 | 44 | | 2.13 (3) recommendations on whether legislative changes are necessary to increase the number |
---|
45 | 45 | | 2.14of projects using qualification-based selection methods before expiration of the pilot program; |
---|
46 | 46 | | 2.15and |
---|
47 | 47 | | 2.16 (4) information detailing the use of qualification-based selection methods on selected |
---|
48 | 48 | | 2.17projects, including the impact on: |
---|
49 | 49 | | 2.18 (i) procurement timelines; |
---|
50 | 50 | | 2.19 (ii) the quality of projects across all phases; |
---|
51 | 51 | | 2.20 (iii) change orders; and |
---|
52 | 52 | | 2.21 (iv) identified improvements to sustainability compared to best value engineering |
---|
53 | 53 | | 2.22practices. |
---|
54 | 54 | | 2.23 Subd. 4.Final report.By October 1, 2028, the commissioner must submit a final report |
---|
55 | 55 | | 2.24to the chairs and ranking minority members of the legislative committees with jurisdiction |
---|
56 | 56 | | 2.25over transportation finance and policy on the use of qualification-based selection methods |
---|
57 | 57 | | 2.26for eligible road construction projects. The final report must include updated information |
---|
58 | 58 | | 2.27on the preliminary report submitted under subdivision 3 and must include: |
---|
59 | 59 | | 2.28 (1) the commissioner's recommended number of projects for which qualification-based |
---|
60 | 60 | | 2.29selection methods are to be used; |
---|
61 | 61 | | 2.30 (2) a cost benefit analysis on the use of qualification-based selection methods compared |
---|
62 | 62 | | 2.31to best value engineering practices for eligible projects under the pilot program; and |
---|
63 | 63 | | 2Section 1. |
---|
64 | 64 | | REVISOR KRB/AC 25-0467203/10/25 3.1 (3) any legislative recommendations to implement a higher number of qualification-based |
---|
65 | 65 | | 3.2selection methods or require the use of those methods for all road construction projects over |
---|
66 | 66 | | 3.3a certain contractual threshold for engineering services. |
---|
67 | 67 | | 3.4 Subd. 5.Expiration.This section expires January 15, 2029, or upon submission of the |
---|
68 | 68 | | 3.5final report in subdivision 4, whichever is sooner. |
---|
69 | 69 | | 3.6 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective the day following final enactment. |
---|
70 | 70 | | 3.7 Sec. 2. APPROPRIATION. |
---|
71 | 71 | | 3.8 $....... in fiscal year 2026 is appropriated from the general fund to the commissioner of |
---|
72 | 72 | | 3.9transportation for the use of qualification-based selection methods and preparation of the |
---|
73 | 73 | | 3.10legislative reports by the Department of Transportation in section 1. This is a onetime |
---|
74 | 74 | | 3.11appropriation and is available until June 30, 2029. |
---|
75 | 75 | | 3Sec. 2. |
---|
76 | 76 | | REVISOR KRB/AC 25-0467203/10/25 |
---|