Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF2759 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/24/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to transportation; establishing a qualification-based selection requirement​
1.3 for certain projects at the Department of Transportation; requiring reports;​
1.4 appropriating money.​
1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.6 Section 1. QUALIFICATION-BASED SELECTION FOR ENGINEERING​
1.7SERVICES PILOT PROGRAM.​
1.8 Subdivision 1.Definitions.(a) For purposes of this section, the following terms have​
1.9the meanings given.​
1.10 (b) "Best value" has the meaning given in Minnesota Statutes, section 16C.28, subdivision​
1.111b.​
1.12 (c) "Commissioner" means the commissioner of transportation.​
1.13 (d) "Contractual threshold" means a project with consultant fees for engineering services​
1.14in excess of $800,000 per project year.​
1.15 (e) "Project" means an uncompleted road construction project where qualification-based​
1.16selection services are utilized.​
1.17 (f) "Qualification-based selection" has the meaning given in Minnesota Statutes, section​
1.1816C.087, subdivision 2.​
1.19 Subd. 2.Establishment.From October 1, 2025, to March 1, 2028, the commissioner​
1.20must use qualification-based selection methods to determine the selection of engineering​
1.21and design professionals on five or more projects in each year meeting the contractual​
1.22threshold. The commissioner may use qualification-based selection methods across different​
1​Section 1.​
REVISOR KRB/AC 25-04672​03/10/25 ​
State of Minnesota​
This Document can be made available​
in alternative formats upon request​
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES​
H. F. No.  2759​
NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
Authored by Koegel and Koznick​03/24/2025​
The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on Transportation Finance and Policy​ 2.1phases of an eligible project, including predesign, design, construction, and reconstruction.​
2.2In selecting which five projects per year are subject to qualification-based selection, the​
2.3commissioner must not use the same project or same phase of a project in a subsequent​
2.4year.​
2.5 Subd. 3.Preliminary report.By October 1, 2026, the commissioner must submit a​
2.6preliminary report to the chairs and ranking minority members of the legislative committees​
2.7with jurisdiction over transportation finance and policy. The report must contain information​
2.8on the use of qualification-based selection methods by the Department of Transportation​
2.9for certain road construction projects, including:​
2.10 (1) a preliminary evaluation of the use of qualification-based selection methods;​
2.11 (2) the development of criteria to determine eligible projects for which qualification-based​
2.12selection is used;​
2.13 (3) recommendations on whether legislative changes are necessary to increase the number​
2.14of projects using qualification-based selection methods before expiration of the pilot program;​
2.15and​
2.16 (4) information detailing the use of qualification-based selection methods on selected​
2.17projects, including the impact on:​
2.18 (i) procurement timelines;​
2.19 (ii) the quality of projects across all phases;​
2.20 (iii) change orders; and​
2.21 (iv) identified improvements to sustainability compared to best value engineering​
2.22practices.​
2.23 Subd. 4.Final report.By October 1, 2028, the commissioner must submit a final report​
2.24to the chairs and ranking minority members of the legislative committees with jurisdiction​
2.25over transportation finance and policy on the use of qualification-based selection methods​
2.26for eligible road construction projects. The final report must include updated information​
2.27on the preliminary report submitted under subdivision 3 and must include:​
2.28 (1) the commissioner's recommended number of projects for which qualification-based​
2.29selection methods are to be used;​
2.30 (2) a cost benefit analysis on the use of qualification-based selection methods compared​
2.31to best value engineering practices for eligible projects under the pilot program; and​
2​Section 1.​
REVISOR KRB/AC 25-04672​03/10/25 ​ 3.1 (3) any legislative recommendations to implement a higher number of qualification-based​
3.2selection methods or require the use of those methods for all road construction projects over​
3.3a certain contractual threshold for engineering services.​
3.4 Subd. 5.Expiration.This section expires January 15, 2029, or upon submission of the​
3.5final report in subdivision 4, whichever is sooner.​
3.6 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective the day following final enactment.​
3.7 Sec. 2. APPROPRIATION.​
3.8 $....... in fiscal year 2026 is appropriated from the general fund to the commissioner of​
3.9transportation for the use of qualification-based selection methods and preparation of the​
3.10legislative reports by the Department of Transportation in section 1. This is a onetime​
3.11appropriation and is available until June 30, 2029.​
3​Sec. 2.​
REVISOR KRB/AC 25-04672​03/10/25 ​