Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF3164 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 1.1 A bill for an act​
22 1.2 relating to workforce development; establishing a veteran relocation bonus program​
33 1.3 for veterans who were recently terminated from federal employment; requiring​
44 1.4 reports; appropriating money.​
55 1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
66 1.6 Section 1. VETERAN RELOCATION BONUS PROGRAM.​
77 1.7 Subdivision 1.Definitions.(a) For the purposes of this section, the following terms have​
88 1.8the meanings given.​
99 1.9 (b) "Commissioner" means the commissioner of employment and economic development.​
1010 1.10 (c) "Eligible veteran" means a person who:​
1111 1.11 (1) is a veteran, as defined in Minnesota Statutes, section 197.447;​
1212 1.12 (2) had their employment with the federal government involuntarily terminated on or​
1313 1.13after January 20, 2025;​
1414 1.14 (3) was not a resident of Minnesota on January 20, 2025, but establishes residency in​
1515 1.15Minnesota before January 1, 2027; and​
1616 1.16 (4) begins working at least 20 hours a week in a job that is principally located in​
1717 1.17Minnesota before January 1, 2027.​
1818 1.18 (d) "Program" means the veteran relocation bonus program created under this section.​
1919 1.19 Subd. 2.Establishment.The commissioner must establish a veteran relocation bonus​
2020 1.20program to pay relocation bonuses to eligible veterans to grow Minnesota's workforce.​
2121 1​Section 1.​
2222 REVISOR SS/AC 25-05124​03/26/25 ​
2323 State of Minnesota​
2424 This Document can be made available​
2525 in alternative formats upon request​
2626 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES​
2727 H. F. No. 3164​
2828 NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
2929 Authored by Norris, Greenman, Pinto, Xiong and Gomez​04/07/2025​
3030 The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on Workforce, Labor, and Economic Development Finance and Policy​ 2.1 Subd. 3.Grants to eligible veterans.(a) To receive a relocation bonus, an eligible​
3131 2.2veteran must apply using a form designed by the commissioner.​
3232 2.3 (b) The commissioner must award grants of $10,000 to eligible veterans on a rolling​
3333 2.4basis.​
3434 2.5 Subd. 4.Report to the legislature.By March 1, 2027, the commissioner must submit​
3535 2.6a report on the veteran relocation bonus program to the chairs and ranking minority members​
3636 2.7of the house of representatives and senate committees with jurisdiction over workforce​
3737 2.8development and veterans and as required by Minnesota Statutes, section 3.195.​
3838 2.9 Sec. 2. APPROPRIATION; VETERAN RELOCATION BONUS PROGRAM.​
3939 2.10 $6,000,000 in fiscal year 2026 is appropriated from the workforce development fund to​
4040 2.11the commissioner of employment and economic development for the veteran relocation​
4141 2.12bonus program. Of this appropriation, $50,000 is for outreach and promotion of the program​
4242 2.13to potentially eligible veterans. This appropriation is available until June 30, 2027.​
4343 2​Sec. 2.​
4444 REVISOR SS/AC 25-05124​03/26/25 ​