Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF3164 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 04/07/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to workforce development; establishing a veteran relocation bonus program​
1.3 for veterans who were recently terminated from federal employment; requiring​
1.4 reports; appropriating money.​
1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.6 Section 1. VETERAN RELOCATION BONUS PROGRAM.​
1.7 Subdivision 1.Definitions.(a) For the purposes of this section, the following terms have​
1.8the meanings given.​
1.9 (b) "Commissioner" means the commissioner of employment and economic development.​
1.10 (c) "Eligible veteran" means a person who:​
1.11 (1) is a veteran, as defined in Minnesota Statutes, section 197.447;​
1.12 (2) had their employment with the federal government involuntarily terminated on or​
1.13after January 20, 2025;​
1.14 (3) was not a resident of Minnesota on January 20, 2025, but establishes residency in​
1.15Minnesota before January 1, 2027; and​
1.16 (4) begins working at least 20 hours a week in a job that is principally located in​
1.17Minnesota before January 1, 2027.​
1.18 (d) "Program" means the veteran relocation bonus program created under this section.​
1.19 Subd. 2.Establishment.The commissioner must establish a veteran relocation bonus​
1.20program to pay relocation bonuses to eligible veterans to grow Minnesota's workforce.​
1​Section 1.​
REVISOR SS/AC 25-05124​03/26/25 ​
State of Minnesota​
This Document can be made available​
in alternative formats upon request​
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES​
H. F. No.  3164​
NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
Authored by Norris, Greenman, Pinto, Xiong and Gomez​04/07/2025​
The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on Workforce, Labor, and Economic Development Finance and Policy​ 2.1 Subd. 3.Grants to eligible veterans.(a) To receive a relocation bonus, an eligible​
2.2veteran must apply using a form designed by the commissioner.​
2.3 (b) The commissioner must award grants of $10,000 to eligible veterans on a rolling​
2.4basis.​
2.5 Subd. 4.Report to the legislature.By March 1, 2027, the commissioner must submit​
2.6a report on the veteran relocation bonus program to the chairs and ranking minority members​
2.7of the house of representatives and senate committees with jurisdiction over workforce​
2.8development and veterans and as required by Minnesota Statutes, section 3.195.​
2.9 Sec. 2. APPROPRIATION; VETERAN RELOCATION BONUS PROGRAM.​
2.10 $6,000,000 in fiscal year 2026 is appropriated from the workforce development fund to​
2.11the commissioner of employment and economic development for the veteran relocation​
2.12bonus program. Of this appropriation, $50,000 is for outreach and promotion of the program​
2.13to potentially eligible veterans. This appropriation is available until June 30, 2027.​
2​Sec. 2.​
REVISOR SS/AC 25-05124​03/26/25 ​