House
|
03/17/2025
|
Bill was not passed as amended vote: 67-67
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Third reading as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Point of order raised, ruled well taken
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
Amendments offered
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2025
|
House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 17, 2025
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Second reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2025
|
Committee report, to adopt as amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2025
|
Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2025
|
Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Rules and Legislative Administration
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2025
|
Authors added Gillman and Sexton
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2025
|
Author added Altendorf
|
|
|
House
|
02/19/2025
|
Author added Davis
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2025
|
Author added Gander
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2025
|
Authors added Fogelman, Rymer, McDonald, Koznick and Murphy
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2025
|
Authors added Schultz, Duran, Perryman, Engen, Zeleznikar, Knudsen, Van Binsbergen, Burkel, Bennett, Hudson, Jacob, Robbins, Swedzinski, Harder, Allen, Backer, Gordon, Scott, and Warwas
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2025
|
Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes
|
|
|