Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF4 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 1.1 A bill for an act​
22 1.2 relating to taxation; proposing an amendment to the Minnesota Constitution by​
33 1.3 adding a section to article X; requiring that a portion of a projected budget surplus​
44 1.4 be returned to state taxpayers.​
55 1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
66 1.6 Section 1. CONSTITUTIONAL AMENDMENT PROPOSED.​
77 1.7 An amendment to the Minnesota Constitution is proposed to the people. If the amendment​
88 1.8is adopted, a section shall be added to article X, to read:​
99 1.9 Sec. 9.The Minnesota tax relief fund is established in the state treasury. The purpose​
1010 1.10of the fund is to set aside surplus tax revenue that must be returned to the taxpayers of this​
1111 1.11state each biennium, as required by this section.​
1212 1.12 If, on the basis of a November forecast of general fund revenues and expenditures, which​
1313 1.13shall be provided by law, there will be a positive unrestricted general fund balance at the​
1414 1.14close of the biennium, the commissioner shall transfer from the general fund to the tax relief​
1515 1.15fund the amount of the tax relief fund surplus, which shall be the amount, if any, by which​
1616 1.16projected revenues exceed projected expenditures by 105 percent. Projected expenditures​
1717 1.17shall not include any amount required by law to be set aside in a budget reserve account,​
1818 1.18but nothing in this section shall be construed to prohibit the legislature from allocating​
1919 1.19projected revenues that do not exceed 105 percent of projected expenditures to a budget​
2020 1.20reserve.​
2121 1.21 Money in the tax relief fund may only be used to return the tax relief fund surplus to the​
2222 1.22property and income taxpayers of this state through onetime refunds, which shall not be​
2323 1.23taxable under the laws of this state, or to offset the cost to the state general fund for onetime​
2424 1​Section 1.​
25-REVISOR EAP H0004-3​HF4 THIRD ENGROSSMENT​
25+REVISOR EAP H0004-2​HF4 SECOND ENGROSSMENT​
2626 55​
2727 Printed​
2828 Page No.​State of Minnesota​
2929 This Document can be made available​
3030 in alternative formats upon request​
3131 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES​
3232 H. F. No. 4​
3333 NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
3434 Authored by Johnson, W.; Niska; Schultz; Duran; Perryman and others​02/06/2025​
3535 The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on Taxes​
3636 Adoption of Report: Amended and re-referred to the Committee on Rules and Legislative Administration​02/27/2025​
3737 Adoption of Report: Re-referred to the Committee on Ways and Means​03/06/2025​
3838 Adoption of Report: Placed on the General Register as Amended​03/10/2025​
39-Read for the Second Time​
40-Calendar for the Day, Amended​03/17/2025​
41-Read Third Time as Amended​
42-Bill was not passed​ 2.1tax reductions. No refunds or offsets for tax reductions shall be made for any amount that​
43-2.2exceeds a property or income taxpayer's liability for tax, or to offset a tax reduction or​
44-2.3provide a refund to a taxpayer whose income exceeded $1,000,000 in the year for which​
45-2.4the refund was provided.​
46-2.5 Sec. 2. SUBMISSION TO VOTERS.​
47-2.6 The proposed amendment must be submitted to the people at the 2026 general election.​
48-2.7The question submitted must be:​
49-2.8 "Shall the Minnesota Constitution be amended to create a Minnesota tax relief fund that​
50-2.9must be used to return projected surplus tax revenue to the income and property taxpayers​
51-2.10of this state for taxpayers with incomes less than $1,000,000?​
52-2.11 Yes ...................
53-"​2.12 No ....................
39+Read for the Second Time​ 2.1tax reductions. No refunds or offsets for tax reductions shall be made for any amount that​
40+2.2exceeds a property or income taxpayer's liability for tax.​
41+2.3 Sec. 2. SUBMISSION TO VOTERS.​
42+2.4 The proposed amendment must be submitted to the people at the 2026 general election.​
43+2.5The question submitted must be:​
44+2.6 "Shall the Minnesota Constitution be amended to create a Minnesota tax relief fund that​
45+2.7must be used to return projected surplus tax revenue to the income and property taxpayers​
46+2.8of this state?​
47+2.9 Yes ...................
48+"​2.10 No ....................
5449 2​Sec. 2.​
55-REVISOR EAP H0004-3​HF4 THIRD ENGROSSMENT​
50+REVISOR EAP H0004-2​HF4 SECOND ENGROSSMENT​