Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF456 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 1.1 A bill for an act​
22 1.2 relating to taxation; sales and use; providing a refundable exemption for​
33 1.3 construction materials for certain projects in the city of Watertown.​
44 1.4BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
55 1.5 Section 1. CITY OF WATERTOWN; SALES TAX EXEMPTION FOR​
66 1.6CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS.​
77 1.7 Subdivision 1.Exemption; refund.(a) Materials and supplies used or consumed in and​
88 1.8equipment incorporated into the construction, reconstruction, upgrade, expansion, renovation,​
99 1.9or remodeling relating to the following projects in the city of Watertown are exempt from​
1010 1.10sales and use tax under Minnesota Statutes, chapter 297A:​
1111 1.11 (1) construction of a new water tower provided that the materials, supplies, and equipment​
1212 1.12are purchased after April 30, 2024, and before February 1, 2026; and​
1313 1.13 (2) construction of a wastewater treatment facility provided that the materials, supplies,​
1414 1.14and equipment are purchased after February 28, 2022, and before July 1, 2025.​
1515 1.15 (b) The tax must be imposed and collected as if the rate under Minnesota Statutes, section​
1616 1.16297A.62, subdivisions 1 and 1a, applied and then refunded in the same manner provided​
1717 1.17for projects under Minnesota Statutes, section 297A.75, subdivision 1, clause (17). Refunds​
1818 1.18for eligible purchases must not be issued until after June 30, 2025.​
1919 1.19 Subd. 2.Appropriation.The amount required to pay the refunds under subdivision 1​
2020 1.20is appropriated from the general fund to the commissioner of revenue.​
2121 1.21 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective retroactively for sales and purchases​
2222 1.22made after February 28, 2022, and before February 1, 2026.​
2323 1​Section 1.​
2424 REVISOR EAP/MI 25-03386​02/06/25 ​
2525 State of Minnesota​
2626 This Document can be made available​
2727 in alternative formats upon request​
2828 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES​
2929 H. F. No. 456​
3030 NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
3131 Authored by Harder​02/13/2025​
3232 The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on Taxes​