Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF456 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/11/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to taxation; sales and use; providing a refundable exemption for​
1.3 construction materials for certain projects in the city of Watertown.​
1.4BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.5 Section 1. CITY OF WATERTOWN; SALES TAX EXEMPTION FOR​
1.6CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS.​
1.7 Subdivision 1.Exemption; refund.(a) Materials and supplies used or consumed in and​
1.8equipment incorporated into the construction, reconstruction, upgrade, expansion, renovation,​
1.9or remodeling relating to the following projects in the city of Watertown are exempt from​
1.10sales and use tax under Minnesota Statutes, chapter 297A:​
1.11 (1) construction of a new water tower provided that the materials, supplies, and equipment​
1.12are purchased after April 30, 2024, and before February 1, 2026; and​
1.13 (2) construction of a wastewater treatment facility provided that the materials, supplies,​
1.14and equipment are purchased after February 28, 2022, and before July 1, 2025.​
1.15 (b) The tax must be imposed and collected as if the rate under Minnesota Statutes, section​
1.16297A.62, subdivisions 1 and 1a, applied and then refunded in the same manner provided​
1.17for projects under Minnesota Statutes, section 297A.75, subdivision 1, clause (17). Refunds​
1.18for eligible purchases must not be issued until after June 30, 2025.​
1.19 Subd. 2.Appropriation.The amount required to pay the refunds under subdivision 1​
1.20is appropriated from the general fund to the commissioner of revenue.​
1.21 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective retroactively for sales and purchases​
1.22made after February 28, 2022, and before February 1, 2026.​
1​Section 1.​
REVISOR EAP/MI 25-03386​02/06/25 ​
State of Minnesota​
This Document can be made available​
in alternative formats upon request​
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES​
H. F. No.  456​
NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
Authored by Harder​02/13/2025​
The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on Taxes​