Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF696 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 1.1 A bill for an act​
22 1.2 relating to health; establishing a rural EMS uncompensated care pool payment​
33 1.3 program; appropriating money.​
44 1.4BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
55 1.5 Section 1. RURAL EMS UNCOMPENSATED CARE POOL PAYMENT PROGRAM.​
66 1.6 Subdivision 1.Definitions.(a) For purposes of this section, the following terms have​
77 1.7the meanings given.​
88 1.8 (b) "Director" has the meaning given in Minnesota Statutes, section 144E.001, subdivision​
99 1.916.​
1010 1.10 (c) "Eligible licensee" means a licensee that primarily provides ambulance services​
1111 1.11outside the metropolitan counties listed in Minnesota Statutes, section 473.121, subdivision​
1212 1.124.​
1313 1.13 (d) "Licensee" has the meaning given in Minnesota Statutes, section 144E.001,​
1414 1.14subdivision 8.​
1515 1.15 (e) "Public safety answering point" has the meaning given in Minnesota Statutes, section​
1616 1.16403.02, subdivision 19.​
1717 1.17 Subd. 2.Payment program established.The director must establish and administer a​
1818 1.18rural EMS uncompensated care pool payment program. Under the program, the director​
1919 1.19must make payments to eligible licensees according to this section.​
2020 1​Section 1.​
2121 REVISOR AGW/LJ 25-02607​02/05/25 ​
2222 State of Minnesota​
2323 This Document can be made available​
2424 in alternative formats upon request​
2525 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES​
2626 H. F. No. 696​
2727 NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
2828 Authored by Backer​02/13/2025​
2929 The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on Health Finance and Policy​ 2.1 Subd. 3.Excluded responses.The director must exclude EMS responses by specialized​
3030 2.2life support, as described in Minnesota Statutes, section 144E.101, subdivision 9, in​
3131 2.3calculating payments under this section.​
3232 2.4 Subd. 4.Application process.(a) An eligible licensee seeking a payment under this​
3333 2.5section must apply to the director by March 31, 2026, in the form and manner determined​
3434 2.6by the director. In the application, the eligible licensee must specify the number of the​
3535 2.7eligible licensee's EMS responses that meet the criteria in subdivision 5.​
3636 2.8 (b) When an eligible licensee, an eligible licensee's parent company, a subsidiary of an​
3737 2.9eligible licensee, or a subsidiary of an eligible licensee's parent company collectively hold​
3838 2.10multiple licenses, the director must treat all such related licensees as a single eligible licensee.​
3939 2.11 Subd. 5.Eligible EMS responses.In order for an EMS response to be an eligible EMS​
4040 2.12response for purposes of subdivision 6, the EMS response must meet the following criteria:​
4141 2.13 (1) the EMS response was initiated by a request for emergency medical services initially​
4242 2.14received by a public safety answering point;​
4343 2.15 (2) an ambulance responded to the scene;​
4444 2.16 (3) the ambulance was not canceled while en route to the scene;​
4545 2.17 (4) the ambulance did not transport a person from the scene to a hospital emergency​
4646 2.18department;​
4747 2.19 (5) the eligible licensee did not receive any payment for the EMS response from any​
4848 2.20source; and​
4949 2.21 (6) the EMS response was initiated between January 1, 2025, and December 31, 2025.​
5050 2.22 Subd. 6.Calculations.(a) The director must calculate payments as provided in paragraphs​
5151 2.23(b) and (c) for an eligible licensee that completes an application under subdivision 4.​
5252 2.24 (b) The director must award points for eligible EMS responses as follows:​
5353 2.25 (1) for eligible EMS responses one to 25, an eligible licensee is awarded ten points per​
5454 2.26response;​
5555 2.27 (2) for eligible EMS responses 26 to 50, an eligible licensee is awarded five points per​
5656 2.28response;​
5757 2.29 (3) for eligible EMS responses 51 to 100, an eligible licensee is awarded three points​
5858 2.30per response;​
5959 2​Section 1.​
6060 REVISOR AGW/LJ 25-02607​02/05/25 ​ 3.1 (4) for eligible EMS responses 101 to 200, an eligible licensee is awarded one point per​
6161 3.2response; and​
6262 3.3 (5) for eligible EMS responses exceeding 200, an eligible licensee is awarded zero points.​
6363 3.4 (c) The director must total the number of all points awarded to all applying eligible​
6464 3.5licensees under paragraph (b) and divide that number by the amount appropriated for purposes​
6565 3.6of this section to determine a per-point amount. The payment for each eligible licensee shall​
6666 3.7be calculated by multiplying the eligible licensee's number of awarded points by the​
6767 3.8established per-point amount.​
6868 3.9 Subd. 7.Payment.The director must certify the payment amount for each eligible​
6969 3.10licensee and must make the full payment to each eligible licensee by May 30, 2026.​
7070 3.11 Sec. 2. APPROPRIATION; RURAL EMS UNCOMPENSA TED CARE POOL​
7171 3.12PAYMENT PROGRAM.​
7272 3.13 $3,000,000 in fiscal year 2026 is appropriated from the general fund to the Office of​
7373 3.14Emergency Medical Services for the rural EMS uncompensated care pool payment program.​
7474 3.15This is a onetime appropriation.​
7575 3​Sec. 2.​
7676 REVISOR AGW/LJ 25-02607​02/05/25 ​