Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF696 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/12/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to health; establishing a rural EMS uncompensated care pool payment​
1.3 program; appropriating money.​
1.4BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.5 Section 1. RURAL EMS UNCOMPENSATED CARE POOL PAYMENT PROGRAM.​
1.6 Subdivision 1.Definitions.(a) For purposes of this section, the following terms have​
1.7the meanings given.​
1.8 (b) "Director" has the meaning given in Minnesota Statutes, section 144E.001, subdivision​
1.916.​
1.10 (c) "Eligible licensee" means a licensee that primarily provides ambulance services​
1.11outside the metropolitan counties listed in Minnesota Statutes, section 473.121, subdivision​
1.124.​
1.13 (d) "Licensee" has the meaning given in Minnesota Statutes, section 144E.001,​
1.14subdivision 8.​
1.15 (e) "Public safety answering point" has the meaning given in Minnesota Statutes, section​
1.16403.02, subdivision 19.​
1.17 Subd. 2.Payment program established.The director must establish and administer a​
1.18rural EMS uncompensated care pool payment program. Under the program, the director​
1.19must make payments to eligible licensees according to this section.​
1​Section 1.​
REVISOR AGW/LJ 25-02607​02/05/25 ​
State of Minnesota​
This Document can be made available​
in alternative formats upon request​
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES​
H. F. No.  696​
NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
Authored by Backer​02/13/2025​
The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on Health Finance and Policy​ 2.1 Subd. 3.Excluded responses.The director must exclude EMS responses by specialized​
2.2life support, as described in Minnesota Statutes, section 144E.101, subdivision 9, in​
2.3calculating payments under this section.​
2.4 Subd. 4.Application process.(a) An eligible licensee seeking a payment under this​
2.5section must apply to the director by March 31, 2026, in the form and manner determined​
2.6by the director. In the application, the eligible licensee must specify the number of the​
2.7eligible licensee's EMS responses that meet the criteria in subdivision 5.​
2.8 (b) When an eligible licensee, an eligible licensee's parent company, a subsidiary of an​
2.9eligible licensee, or a subsidiary of an eligible licensee's parent company collectively hold​
2.10multiple licenses, the director must treat all such related licensees as a single eligible licensee.​
2.11 Subd. 5.Eligible EMS responses.In order for an EMS response to be an eligible EMS​
2.12response for purposes of subdivision 6, the EMS response must meet the following criteria:​
2.13 (1) the EMS response was initiated by a request for emergency medical services initially​
2.14received by a public safety answering point;​
2.15 (2) an ambulance responded to the scene;​
2.16 (3) the ambulance was not canceled while en route to the scene;​
2.17 (4) the ambulance did not transport a person from the scene to a hospital emergency​
2.18department;​
2.19 (5) the eligible licensee did not receive any payment for the EMS response from any​
2.20source; and​
2.21 (6) the EMS response was initiated between January 1, 2025, and December 31, 2025.​
2.22 Subd. 6.Calculations.(a) The director must calculate payments as provided in paragraphs​
2.23(b) and (c) for an eligible licensee that completes an application under subdivision 4.​
2.24 (b) The director must award points for eligible EMS responses as follows:​
2.25 (1) for eligible EMS responses one to 25, an eligible licensee is awarded ten points per​
2.26response;​
2.27 (2) for eligible EMS responses 26 to 50, an eligible licensee is awarded five points per​
2.28response;​
2.29 (3) for eligible EMS responses 51 to 100, an eligible licensee is awarded three points​
2.30per response;​
2​Section 1.​
REVISOR AGW/LJ 25-02607​02/05/25 ​ 3.1 (4) for eligible EMS responses 101 to 200, an eligible licensee is awarded one point per​
3.2response; and​
3.3 (5) for eligible EMS responses exceeding 200, an eligible licensee is awarded zero points.​
3.4 (c) The director must total the number of all points awarded to all applying eligible​
3.5licensees under paragraph (b) and divide that number by the amount appropriated for purposes​
3.6of this section to determine a per-point amount. The payment for each eligible licensee shall​
3.7be calculated by multiplying the eligible licensee's number of awarded points by the​
3.8established per-point amount.​
3.9 Subd. 7.Payment.The director must certify the payment amount for each eligible​
3.10licensee and must make the full payment to each eligible licensee by May 30, 2026.​
3.11 Sec. 2. APPROPRIATION; RURAL EMS UNCOMPENSA TED CARE POOL​
3.12PAYMENT PROGRAM.​
3.13 $3,000,000 in fiscal year 2026 is appropriated from the general fund to the Office of​
3.14Emergency Medical Services for the rural EMS uncompensated care pool payment program.​
3.15This is a onetime appropriation.​
3​Sec. 2.​
REVISOR AGW/LJ 25-02607​02/05/25 ​