1 | 1 | | 1.1 A bill for an act |
---|
2 | 2 | | 1.2 relating to human services; removing the sunset of certain nursing facility property |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1.3 rate increases; removing a nursing facility property rate increase; amending |
---|
4 | 4 | | 1.4 Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 256B.434, subdivision 4k. |
---|
5 | 5 | | 1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA: |
---|
6 | 6 | | 1.6 Section 1. Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 256B.434, subdivision 4k, is amended to read: |
---|
7 | 7 | | 1.7 Subd. 4k.Property rate increase for certain nursing facilities.(a) A rate increase |
---|
8 | 8 | | 1.8under this subdivision ends upon the effective date of the transition of the facility's property |
---|
9 | 9 | | 1.9rate to a property payment rate under section 256R.26, subdivision 8, or May 31, 2026, |
---|
10 | 10 | | 1.10whichever is earlier. |
---|
11 | 11 | | 1.11 (b) The commissioner shall increase the property rate of a nursing facility located in the |
---|
12 | 12 | | 1.12city of St. Paul at 1415 Almond Avenue in Ramsey County by $10.65 on January 1, 2025. |
---|
13 | 13 | | 1.13 (c) The commissioner shall increase the property rate of a nursing facility located in the |
---|
14 | 14 | | 1.14city of Duluth at 3111 Church Place in St. Louis County by $20.81 on January 1, 2025. |
---|
15 | 15 | | 1.15 (d) The commissioner shall increase the property rate of a nursing facility located in the |
---|
16 | 16 | | 1.16city of Chatfield at 1102 Liberty Street SE in Fillmore County by $21.35 on January 1, |
---|
17 | 17 | | 1.172025. |
---|
18 | 18 | | 1.18 (e) Effective January 1, 2025, through June 30, 2025, the commissioner shall increase |
---|
19 | 19 | | 1.19the property rate of a nursing facility located in the city of Fergus Falls at 1131 South |
---|
20 | 20 | | 1.20Mabelle Avenue in Ottertail County by $38.56. |
---|
21 | 21 | | 1.21 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective July 1, 2025. |
---|
22 | 22 | | 1Section 1. |
---|
23 | 23 | | REVISOR AGW/HL 25-0063411/18/24 |
---|
24 | 24 | | State of Minnesota |
---|
25 | 25 | | This Document can be made available |
---|
26 | 26 | | in alternative formats upon request |
---|
27 | 27 | | HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES |
---|
28 | 28 | | H. F. No. 702 |
---|
29 | 29 | | NINETY-FOURTH SESSION |
---|
30 | 30 | | Authored by Davids, Finke and Johnson, P.,02/13/2025 |
---|
31 | 31 | | The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on Human Services Finance and Policy |
---|