Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota House Bill HF702 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/12/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to human services; removing the sunset of certain nursing facility property​
1.3 rate increases; removing a nursing facility property rate increase; amending​
1.4 Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 256B.434, subdivision 4k.​
1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.6 Section 1. Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 256B.434, subdivision 4k, is amended to read:​
1.7 Subd. 4k.Property rate increase for certain nursing facilities.(a) A rate increase​
1.8under this subdivision ends upon the effective date of the transition of the facility's property​
1.9rate to a property payment rate under section 256R.26, subdivision 8, or May 31, 2026,​
1.10whichever is earlier.​
1.11 (b) The commissioner shall increase the property rate of a nursing facility located in the​
1.12city of St. Paul at 1415 Almond Avenue in Ramsey County by $10.65 on January 1, 2025.​
1.13 (c) The commissioner shall increase the property rate of a nursing facility located in the​
1.14city of Duluth at 3111 Church Place in St. Louis County by $20.81 on January 1, 2025.​
1.15 (d) The commissioner shall increase the property rate of a nursing facility located in the​
1.16city of Chatfield at 1102 Liberty Street SE in Fillmore County by $21.35 on January 1,​
1.172025.​
1.18 (e) Effective January 1, 2025, through June 30, 2025, the commissioner shall increase​
1.19the property rate of a nursing facility located in the city of Fergus Falls at 1131 South​
1.20Mabelle Avenue in Ottertail County by $38.56.​
1.21 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective July 1, 2025.​
1​Section 1.​
REVISOR AGW/HL 25-00634​11/18/24 ​
State of Minnesota​
This Document can be made available​
in alternative formats upon request​
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES​
H. F. No.  702​
NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
Authored by Davids, Finke and Johnson, P.,​02/13/2025​
The bill was read for the first time and referred to the Committee on Human Services Finance and Policy​