Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF195 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 1.1 A bill for an act​
22 1.2 relating to taxation; sales and use; providing a refundable exemption for​
33 1.3 construction materials for construction of a city hall in the city of Columbia Heights.​
44 1.4BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
55 1.5 Section 1. CITY OF COLUMBIA HEIGHTS; SALES TAX EXEMPTION FOR​
66 1.6CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS.​
77 1.7 Subdivision 1.Exemption; refund.(a) Materials and supplies used or consumed in and​
88 1.8equipment incorporated into the construction, reconstruction, upgrade, expansion, renovation,​
99 1.9or remodeling of a new city hall in the city of Columbia Heights are exempt from sales and​
1010 1.10use tax under Minnesota Statutes, chapter 297A, provided that the materials, supplies, and​
1111 1.11equipment are purchased after August 31, 2021, and before April 1, 2024.​
1212 1.12 (b) The tax must be imposed and collected as if the rate under Minnesota Statutes, section​
1313 1.13297A.62, subdivisions 1 and 1a, applied, and then refunded in the same manner provided​
1414 1.14for projects under Minnesota Statutes, section 297A.75, subdivision 1, clause (17). Refunds​
1515 1.15for eligible purchases must not be issued until after June 30, 2025. Notwithstanding​
1616 1.16Minnesota Statutes, section 289A.40, subdivision 1, applicants may file claims for refund​
1717 1.17under this section through December 31, 2025.​
1818 1.18 Subd. 2.Appropriation.The amount required to pay the refunds under subdivision 1​
1919 1.19is appropriated from the general fund to the commissioner of revenue.​
2020 1.20 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective retroactively for sales and purchases​
2121 1.21made after August 31, 2021, and before April 1, 2024.​
2222 1​Section 1.​
2323 25-01140 as introduced​12/18/24 REVISOR EAP/RC​
2424 SENATE​
2525 STATE OF MINNESOTA​
2626 S.F. No. 195​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
2727 (SENATE AUTHORS: KUNESH)​
2828 OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
2929 Introduction and first reading​01/16/2025​
3030 Referred to Taxes​