Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF195 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/15/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to taxation; sales and use; providing a refundable exemption for​
1.3 construction materials for construction of a city hall in the city of Columbia Heights.​
1.4BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.5 Section 1. CITY OF COLUMBIA HEIGHTS; SALES TAX EXEMPTION FOR​
1.6CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS.​
1.7 Subdivision 1.Exemption; refund.(a) Materials and supplies used or consumed in and​
1.8equipment incorporated into the construction, reconstruction, upgrade, expansion, renovation,​
1.9or remodeling of a new city hall in the city of Columbia Heights are exempt from sales and​
1.10use tax under Minnesota Statutes, chapter 297A, provided that the materials, supplies, and​
1.11equipment are purchased after August 31, 2021, and before April 1, 2024.​
1.12 (b) The tax must be imposed and collected as if the rate under Minnesota Statutes, section​
1.13297A.62, subdivisions 1 and 1a, applied, and then refunded in the same manner provided​
1.14for projects under Minnesota Statutes, section 297A.75, subdivision 1, clause (17). Refunds​
1.15for eligible purchases must not be issued until after June 30, 2025. Notwithstanding​
1.16Minnesota Statutes, section 289A.40, subdivision 1, applicants may file claims for refund​
1.17under this section through December 31, 2025.​
1.18 Subd. 2.Appropriation.The amount required to pay the refunds under subdivision 1​
1.19is appropriated from the general fund to the commissioner of revenue.​
1.20 EFFECTIVE DATE.This section is effective retroactively for sales and purchases​
1.21made after August 31, 2021, and before April 1, 2024.​
1​Section 1.​
25-01140 as introduced​12/18/24 REVISOR EAP/RC​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 195​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: KUNESH)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​01/16/2025​
Referred to Taxes​