Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF2853 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11 1.1 A bill for an act​
22 1.2 relating to human services; appropriating money for supported decision making​
33 1.3 programs; requiring a report; appropriating money; amending Laws 2023, chapter​
44 1.4 61, article 1, section 61, subdivision 4.​
55 1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
66 1.6 Section 1. Laws 2023, chapter 61, article 1, section 61, subdivision 4, is amended to read:​
77 1.7 Subd. 4.Evaluation and report.By December 1, 2024, the commissioner must submit​
88 1.8to the chairs and ranking minority members of the legislative committees with jurisdiction​
99 1.9over human services finance and policy an interim report on the impact and outcomes of​
1010 1.10the grants, including the number of grants awarded and the organizations receiving the​
1111 1.11grants. The interim report must include any available evidence of how grantees were able​
1212 1.12to increase utilization of supported decision making and reduce or avoid more restrictive​
1313 1.13forms of decision making such as guardianship and conservatorship. By December 1, 2025,​
1414 1.14the commissioner must submit to the chairs and ranking minority members of the legislative​
1515 1.15committees with jurisdiction over human services finance and policy a final second interim​
1616 1.16report on the impact and outcomes of the grants, including any updated information from​
1717 1.17the interim report and the total number of people served by the grants. The final second​
1818 1.18interim report must also detail how the money was used to achieve the requirements in​
1919 1.19subdivision 3, paragraph (b). By December 1, 2027, the commissioner must submit to the​
2020 1.20chairs and ranking minority members of the legislative committees with jurisdiction over​
2121 1.21human services finance and policy a final report on the impact and outcomes of the grants,​
2222 1.22including any updated information from the interim reports and the total number of people​
2323 1.23served by the grants.​
2424 1​Section 1.​
2525 25-04128 as introduced​02/21/25 REVISOR DTT/AC​
2626 SENATE​
2727 STATE OF MINNESOTA​
2828 S.F. No. 2853​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
2929 (SENATE AUTHORS: MAYE QUADE)​
3030 OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
3131 Introduction and first reading​03/20/2025​
3232 Referred to Human Services​ 2.1 Sec. 2. APPROPRIATION; SUPPORTED DECISION MAKING PROGRAMS.​
3333 2.2 $2,000,000 in fiscal year 2026 is appropriated from the general fund to the commissioner​
3434 2.3of human services for supported decision grants under Laws 2023, chapter 61, article 1,​
3535 2.4section 61. This is a onetime appropriation and is available until June 30, 2027.​
3636 2​Sec. 2.​
3737 25-04128 as introduced​02/21/25 REVISOR DTT/AC​