Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF2853 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/19/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to human services; appropriating money for supported decision making​
1.3 programs; requiring a report; appropriating money; amending Laws 2023, chapter​
1.4 61, article 1, section 61, subdivision 4.​
1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.6 Section 1. Laws 2023, chapter 61, article 1, section 61, subdivision 4, is amended to read:​
1.7 Subd. 4.Evaluation and report.By December 1, 2024, the commissioner must submit​
1.8to the chairs and ranking minority members of the legislative committees with jurisdiction​
1.9over human services finance and policy an interim report on the impact and outcomes of​
1.10the grants, including the number of grants awarded and the organizations receiving the​
1.11grants. The interim report must include any available evidence of how grantees were able​
1.12to increase utilization of supported decision making and reduce or avoid more restrictive​
1.13forms of decision making such as guardianship and conservatorship. By December 1, 2025,​
1.14the commissioner must submit to the chairs and ranking minority members of the legislative​
1.15committees with jurisdiction over human services finance and policy a final second interim​
1.16report on the impact and outcomes of the grants, including any updated information from​
1.17the interim report and the total number of people served by the grants. The final second​
1.18interim report must also detail how the money was used to achieve the requirements in​
1.19subdivision 3, paragraph (b). By December 1, 2027, the commissioner must submit to the​
1.20chairs and ranking minority members of the legislative committees with jurisdiction over​
1.21human services finance and policy a final report on the impact and outcomes of the grants,​
1.22including any updated information from the interim reports and the total number of people​
1.23served by the grants.​
1​Section 1.​
25-04128 as introduced​02/21/25 REVISOR DTT/AC​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 2853​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: MAYE QUADE)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​03/20/2025​
Referred to Human Services​ 2.1 Sec. 2. APPROPRIATION; SUPPORTED DECISION MAKING PROGRAMS.​
2.2 $2,000,000 in fiscal year 2026 is appropriated from the general fund to the commissioner​
2.3of human services for supported decision grants under Laws 2023, chapter 61, article 1,​
2.4section 61. This is a onetime appropriation and is available until June 30, 2027.​
2​Sec. 2.​
25-04128 as introduced​02/21/25 REVISOR DTT/AC​