Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF304 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 1.1 A bill for an act​
2-1.2 relating to agriculture; appropriating money for Minnesota Made Per- and
3-1.3 Polyfluoroalkyl Substances (PFAS) Alternative grants.​
2+1.2 relating to economic development; appropriating money for Minnesota Made Per-​
3+1.3 and Polyfluoroalkyl Substances (PFAS) Alternative grants.​
44 1.4BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
55 1.5 Section 1. MINNESOTA MADE PFAS ALTERNATIVE GRANT.​
66 1.6 Subdivision 1.Appropriation.$10,000,000 in fiscal year 2026 is appropriated from​
7-1.7the general fund to the commissioner of agriculture for the Minnesota Made PFAS Alternative​
8-1.8grants under this section. Grant recipients under this section must submit a report to the​
9-1.9commissioner detailing the use of grant funds, the number of jobs created due to the grant,​
10-1.10and the wage and benefit information for the jobs created due to the grant. The report is due​
11-1.1130 days after the grant recipients have expended the grant funds. The commissioner must​
12-1.12forward copies of these reports to the chairs and ranking minority members of the legislative​
13-1.13committees with jurisdiction over agriculture and economic development and to the​
14-1.14Legislative Reference Library in compliance with Minnesota Statutes, section 3.195. This​
15-1.15is a onetime appropriation and is available until June 30, 2027.​
16-1.16 Subd. 2.Eligibility.The commissioner of agriculture shall establish a 30-day application​
17-1.17window. Grantees must be based in Minnesota and demonstrate the capacity to execute​
18-1.18projects that increase the availability of new safer PFAS-free alternatives utilizing products​
19-1.19from rural Minnesota in crop years 2025 and beyond. Preference will be given for applicants​
20-1.20who can demonstrate:​
21-1.21 (1) extensive knowledge and experience in fiber technologies, material science, and​
22-1.22coatings;​
7+1.7the general fund to the commissioner of employment and economic development for the​
8+1.8Minnesota Made PFAS Alternative grants under this section. This is a onetime appropriation​
9+1.9and is available until July 1, 2027.​
10+1.10 Subd. 2.Eligibility.The commissioner of employment and economic development shall​
11+1.11establish a 30-day application window. Grantees must be based in Minnesota and demonstrate​
12+1.12the capacity to execute projects that increase the availability of new PFAS-free alternatives​
13+1.13utilizing products from rural Minnesota in crop years 2025 and beyond. Preference will be​
14+1.14given for applicants who can demonstrate:​
15+1.15 (1) extensive knowledge and experience in fiber technologies, material science, and​
16+1.16coatings;​
17+1.17 (2) capacity to produce products that will utilize agricultural co-product or waste streams​
18+1.18and not compete with food for land, reduce the greenhouse gas impact of transportation​
19+1.19through local sourcing of raw materials, production and use through renewable energy​
20+1.20sources, feedstocks, and formulations; and​
2321 1​Section 1.​
24-S0304-1 1st EngrossmentSF304 REVISOR SS​
22+25-00644 as introduced12/18/24 REVISOR SS/NS
2523 SENATE​
2624 STATE OF MINNESOTA​
2725 S.F. No. 304​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
28-(SENATE AUTHORS: LANG, Pratt, Frentz and Putnam)​
26+(SENATE AUTHORS: LANG and Pratt)​
2927 OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
30-Introduction and first reading​113​01/21/2025​
31-Referred to Jobs and Economic Development​
32-Author added Frentz​230​01/30/2025​
33-Author added Putnam​02/06/2025​
34-Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Agriculture, Veterans, Broadband and Rural​
35-Development​
36-02/10/2025​ 2.1 (2) capacity to produce products that will utilize agricultural coproduct or waste streams​
37-2.2and not compete with food for land;​
38-2.3 (3) ability to reduce greenhouse gas emissions through sourcing raw materials locally​
39-2.4to decrease the transportation emissions and during production through the use of renewable​
40-2.5energy sources, feedstocks, and formulations; and​
41-2.6 (4) utilization of techniques that will create value in agricultural waste that are currently​
42-2.7being underutilized and provide a path for viable alternatives for packaging that excludes​
43-2.8PFAS chemicals.​
44-2.9 Subd. 3.Approved use.(a) Grant proceeds may be used to expand the manufacturing,​
45-2.10processing, and handling of agriculture-related products and PFAS-free alternatives produced​
46-2.11in the state.​
47-2.12 (b) The maximum grant award is $5,000,000. The minimum award is $2,000,000. Grant​
48-2.13terms must not exceed one year.​
28+Introduction and first reading​01/21/2025​
29+Referred to Jobs and Economic Development​ 2.1 (3) utilization of techniques that will create value in agricultural waste that are currently​
30+2.2being underutilized and provide a path for viable alternatives for packaging that excludes​
31+2.3PFAS chemicals.​
32+2.4 Subd. 3.Approved use.(a) Grant proceeds may be used to expand the manufacturing,​
33+2.5processing, and handling of agriculture-related products and PFAS-free alternatives produced​
34+2.6in the state.​
35+2.7 (b) The maximum grant award is $5,000,000. The minimum award is $2,000,000. Grant​
36+2.8terms must not exceed one year.​
4937 2​Section 1.​
50-S0304-1 1st EngrossmentSF304 REVISOR SS​
38+25-00644 as introduced12/18/24 REVISOR SS/NS