Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF304 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 02/10/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to agriculture; appropriating money for Minnesota Made Per- and​
1.3 Polyfluoroalkyl Substances (PFAS) Alternative grants.​
1.4BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.5 Section 1. MINNESOTA MADE PFAS ALTERNATIVE GRANT.​
1.6 Subdivision 1.Appropriation.$10,000,000 in fiscal year 2026 is appropriated from​
1.7the general fund to the commissioner of agriculture for the Minnesota Made PFAS Alternative​
1.8grants under this section. Grant recipients under this section must submit a report to the​
1.9commissioner detailing the use of grant funds, the number of jobs created due to the grant,​
1.10and the wage and benefit information for the jobs created due to the grant. The report is due​
1.1130 days after the grant recipients have expended the grant funds. The commissioner must​
1.12forward copies of these reports to the chairs and ranking minority members of the legislative​
1.13committees with jurisdiction over agriculture and economic development and to the​
1.14Legislative Reference Library in compliance with Minnesota Statutes, section 3.195. This​
1.15is a onetime appropriation and is available until June 30, 2027.​
1.16 Subd. 2.Eligibility.The commissioner of agriculture shall establish a 30-day application​
1.17window. Grantees must be based in Minnesota and demonstrate the capacity to execute​
1.18projects that increase the availability of new safer PFAS-free alternatives utilizing products​
1.19from rural Minnesota in crop years 2025 and beyond. Preference will be given for applicants​
1.20who can demonstrate:​
1.21 (1) extensive knowledge and experience in fiber technologies, material science, and​
1.22coatings;​
1​Section 1.​
S0304-1 1st Engrossment​SF304 REVISOR SS​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 304​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: LANG, Pratt, Frentz and Putnam)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​113​01/21/2025​
Referred to Jobs and Economic Development​
Author added Frentz​230​01/30/2025​
Author added Putnam​02/06/2025​
Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Agriculture, Veterans, Broadband and Rural​
Development​
02/10/2025​ 2.1 (2) capacity to produce products that will utilize agricultural coproduct or waste streams​
2.2and not compete with food for land;​
2.3 (3) ability to reduce greenhouse gas emissions through sourcing raw materials locally​
2.4to decrease the transportation emissions and during production through the use of renewable​
2.5energy sources, feedstocks, and formulations; and​
2.6 (4) utilization of techniques that will create value in agricultural waste that are currently​
2.7being underutilized and provide a path for viable alternatives for packaging that excludes​
2.8PFAS chemicals.​
2.9 Subd. 3.Approved use.(a) Grant proceeds may be used to expand the manufacturing,​
2.10processing, and handling of agriculture-related products and PFAS-free alternatives produced​
2.11in the state.​
2.12 (b) The maximum grant award is $5,000,000. The minimum award is $2,000,000. Grant​
2.13terms must not exceed one year.​
2​Section 1.​
S0304-1 1st Engrossment​SF304 REVISOR SS​