1 | 1 | | 1.1 A bill for an act |
---|
2 | 2 | | 1.2 relating to human services; requiring Tribally licensed residential substance use |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1.3 disorder treatment providers to enroll in the substance use disorder demonstration |
---|
4 | 4 | | 1.4 project; amending Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 256B.0759, subdivision 2. |
---|
5 | 5 | | 1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA: |
---|
6 | 6 | | 1.6 Section 1. Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 256B.0759, subdivision 2, is amended to read: |
---|
7 | 7 | | 1.7 Subd. 2.Provider participation.(a) Programs licensed by the Department of Human |
---|
8 | 8 | | 1.8Services as nonresidential substance use disorder treatment programs that receive payment |
---|
9 | 9 | | 1.9under this chapter must enroll as demonstration project providers and meet the requirements |
---|
10 | 10 | | 1.10of subdivision 3 by January 1, 2025. Programs that do not meet the requirements of this |
---|
11 | 11 | | 1.11paragraph are ineligible for payment for services provided under section 256B.0625. |
---|
12 | 12 | | 1.12 (b) Programs licensed by the Department of Human Services as residential treatment |
---|
13 | 13 | | 1.13programs according to section 245G.21 that receive payment under this chapter must enroll |
---|
14 | 14 | | 1.14as demonstration project providers and meet the requirements of subdivision 3 by January |
---|
15 | 15 | | 1.151, 2024. Programs that do not meet the requirements of this paragraph are ineligible for |
---|
16 | 16 | | 1.16payment for services provided under section 256B.0625. |
---|
17 | 17 | | 1.17 (c) Programs licensed by the Department of Human Services as residential treatment |
---|
18 | 18 | | 1.18programs according to section 245G.21 that receive payment under this chapter, are licensed |
---|
19 | 19 | | 1.19as a hospital under sections 144.50 to 144.581, and provide only ASAM 3.7 medically |
---|
20 | 20 | | 1.20monitored inpatient level of care are not required to enroll as demonstration project providers. |
---|
21 | 21 | | 1.21Programs meeting these criteria must submit evidence of providing the required level of |
---|
22 | 22 | | 1.22care to the commissioner to be exempt from enrolling in the demonstration. |
---|
23 | 23 | | 1Section 1. |
---|
24 | 24 | | 25-05165 as introduced03/21/25 REVISOR AGW/VJ |
---|
25 | 25 | | SENATE |
---|
26 | 26 | | STATE OF MINNESOTA |
---|
27 | 27 | | S.F. No. 3170NINETY-FOURTH SESSION |
---|
28 | 28 | | (SENATE AUTHORS: UTKE, Hoffman and Gruenhagen) |
---|
29 | 29 | | OFFICIAL STATUSD-PGDATE |
---|
30 | 30 | | Introduction and first reading04/01/2025 |
---|
31 | 31 | | Referred to Human Services 2.1 (d) Programs licensed by the Department of Human Services as withdrawal management |
---|
32 | 32 | | 2.2programs according to chapter 245F that receive payment under this chapter must enroll as |
---|
33 | 33 | | 2.3demonstration project providers and meet the requirements of subdivision 3 by January 1, |
---|
34 | 34 | | 2.42024. Programs that do not meet the requirements of this paragraph are ineligible for payment |
---|
35 | 35 | | 2.5for services provided under section 256B.0625. |
---|
36 | 36 | | 2.6 (e) Out-of-state residential substance use disorder treatment programs that receive |
---|
37 | 37 | | 2.7payment under this chapter must enroll as demonstration project providers and meet the |
---|
38 | 38 | | 2.8requirements of subdivision 3 by January 1, 2024. Programs that do not meet the requirements |
---|
39 | 39 | | 2.9of this paragraph are ineligible for payment for services provided under section 256B.0625. |
---|
40 | 40 | | 2.10 (f) Tribally licensed programs, except Tribally licensed residential treatment programs, |
---|
41 | 41 | | 2.11may elect to participate in the demonstration project and meet the requirements of subdivision |
---|
42 | 42 | | 2.123. The Department of Human Services must consult with Tribal Nations to discuss |
---|
43 | 43 | | 2.13participation of nonresidential programs in the substance use disorder demonstration project. |
---|
44 | 44 | | 2.14Tribally licensed residential treatment programs must enroll as demonstration project |
---|
45 | 45 | | 2.15providers and meet the requirements of subdivision 3 by January 1, 2028. Residential |
---|
46 | 46 | | 2.16treatment programs that do not meet the requirements of this paragraph are ineligible for |
---|
47 | 47 | | 2.17payment for services provided under section 256B.0625. |
---|
48 | 48 | | 2.18 (g) The commissioner shall allow providers enrolled in the demonstration project before |
---|
49 | 49 | | 2.19July 1, 2021, to receive applicable rate enhancements authorized under subdivision 4 for |
---|
50 | 50 | | 2.20all services provided on or after the date of enrollment, except that the commissioner shall |
---|
51 | 51 | | 2.21allow a provider to receive applicable rate enhancements authorized under subdivision 4 |
---|
52 | 52 | | 2.22for services provided on or after July 22, 2020, to fee-for-service enrollees, and on or after |
---|
53 | 53 | | 2.23January 1, 2021, to managed care enrollees, if the provider meets all of the following |
---|
54 | 54 | | 2.24requirements: |
---|
55 | 55 | | 2.25 (1) the provider attests that during the time period for which the provider is seeking the |
---|
56 | 56 | | 2.26rate enhancement, the provider took meaningful steps in their plan approved by the |
---|
57 | 57 | | 2.27commissioner to meet the demonstration project requirements in subdivision 3; and |
---|
58 | 58 | | 2.28 (2) the provider submits attestation and evidence, including all information requested |
---|
59 | 59 | | 2.29by the commissioner, of meeting the requirements of subdivision 3 to the commissioner in |
---|
60 | 60 | | 2.30a format required by the commissioner. |
---|
61 | 61 | | 2.31 (h) The commissioner may recoup any rate enhancements paid under paragraph (g) to |
---|
62 | 62 | | 2.32a provider that does not meet the requirements of subdivision 3 by July 1, 2021. |
---|
63 | 63 | | 2Section 1. |
---|
64 | 64 | | 25-05165 as introduced03/21/25 REVISOR AGW/VJ |
---|