Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF3170 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/28/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to human services; requiring Tribally licensed residential substance use​
1.3 disorder treatment providers to enroll in the substance use disorder demonstration​
1.4 project; amending Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 256B.0759, subdivision 2.​
1.5BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.6 Section 1. Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 256B.0759, subdivision 2, is amended to read:​
1.7 Subd. 2.Provider participation.(a) Programs licensed by the Department of Human​
1.8Services as nonresidential substance use disorder treatment programs that receive payment​
1.9under this chapter must enroll as demonstration project providers and meet the requirements​
1.10of subdivision 3 by January 1, 2025. Programs that do not meet the requirements of this​
1.11paragraph are ineligible for payment for services provided under section 256B.0625.​
1.12 (b) Programs licensed by the Department of Human Services as residential treatment​
1.13programs according to section 245G.21 that receive payment under this chapter must enroll​
1.14as demonstration project providers and meet the requirements of subdivision 3 by January​
1.151, 2024. Programs that do not meet the requirements of this paragraph are ineligible for​
1.16payment for services provided under section 256B.0625.​
1.17 (c) Programs licensed by the Department of Human Services as residential treatment​
1.18programs according to section 245G.21 that receive payment under this chapter, are licensed​
1.19as a hospital under sections 144.50 to 144.581, and provide only ASAM 3.7 medically​
1.20monitored inpatient level of care are not required to enroll as demonstration project providers.​
1.21Programs meeting these criteria must submit evidence of providing the required level of​
1.22care to the commissioner to be exempt from enrolling in the demonstration.​
1​Section 1.​
25-05165 as introduced​03/21/25 REVISOR AGW/VJ​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 3170​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: UTKE, Hoffman and Gruenhagen)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​04/01/2025​
Referred to Human Services​ 2.1 (d) Programs licensed by the Department of Human Services as withdrawal management​
2.2programs according to chapter 245F that receive payment under this chapter must enroll as​
2.3demonstration project providers and meet the requirements of subdivision 3 by January 1,​
2.42024. Programs that do not meet the requirements of this paragraph are ineligible for payment​
2.5for services provided under section 256B.0625.​
2.6 (e) Out-of-state residential substance use disorder treatment programs that receive​
2.7payment under this chapter must enroll as demonstration project providers and meet the​
2.8requirements of subdivision 3 by January 1, 2024. Programs that do not meet the requirements​
2.9of this paragraph are ineligible for payment for services provided under section 256B.0625.​
2.10 (f) Tribally licensed programs, except Tribally licensed residential treatment programs,​
2.11may elect to participate in the demonstration project and meet the requirements of subdivision​
2.123. The Department of Human Services must consult with Tribal Nations to discuss​
2.13participation of nonresidential programs in the substance use disorder demonstration project.​
2.14Tribally licensed residential treatment programs must enroll as demonstration project​
2.15providers and meet the requirements of subdivision 3 by January 1, 2028. Residential​
2.16treatment programs that do not meet the requirements of this paragraph are ineligible for​
2.17payment for services provided under section 256B.0625.​
2.18 (g) The commissioner shall allow providers enrolled in the demonstration project before​
2.19July 1, 2021, to receive applicable rate enhancements authorized under subdivision 4 for​
2.20all services provided on or after the date of enrollment, except that the commissioner shall​
2.21allow a provider to receive applicable rate enhancements authorized under subdivision 4​
2.22for services provided on or after July 22, 2020, to fee-for-service enrollees, and on or after​
2.23January 1, 2021, to managed care enrollees, if the provider meets all of the following​
2.24requirements:​
2.25 (1) the provider attests that during the time period for which the provider is seeking the​
2.26rate enhancement, the provider took meaningful steps in their plan approved by the​
2.27commissioner to meet the demonstration project requirements in subdivision 3; and​
2.28 (2) the provider submits attestation and evidence, including all information requested​
2.29by the commissioner, of meeting the requirements of subdivision 3 to the commissioner in​
2.30a format required by the commissioner.​
2.31 (h) The commissioner may recoup any rate enhancements paid under paragraph (g) to​
2.32a provider that does not meet the requirements of subdivision 3 by July 1, 2021.​
2​Section 1.​
25-05165 as introduced​03/21/25 REVISOR AGW/VJ​