1 | 1 | | 1.1 A bill for an act |
---|
2 | 2 | | 1.2 relating to labor; providing an increase to minimum wages; amending Minnesota |
---|
3 | 3 | | 1.3 Statutes 2024, section 177.24, subdivision 1. |
---|
4 | 4 | | 1.4BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA: |
---|
5 | 5 | | 1.5 Section 1. Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 177.24, subdivision 1, is amended to read: |
---|
6 | 6 | | 1.6 Subdivision 1.Amount.(a) Except as otherwise provided in sections 177.21 to 177.35, |
---|
7 | 7 | | 1.7every employer must pay each employee wages at a rate of at least: |
---|
8 | 8 | | 1.8 (1) $8.00 $15.00 per hour beginning August 1, 2014 2025; |
---|
9 | 9 | | 1.9 (2) $9.00 $16.25 per hour beginning August 1, 2015 2026; |
---|
10 | 10 | | 1.10 (3) $9.50 $17.50 per hour beginning August 1, 2016 2027; and |
---|
11 | 11 | | 1.11 (4) $18.75 per hour beginning August 1, 2028; |
---|
12 | 12 | | 1.12 (5) $20.00 per hour beginning August 1, 2029; and |
---|
13 | 13 | | 1.13 (4) (6) the rate established under paragraph (c) beginning January 1, 2018 2030. |
---|
14 | 14 | | 1.14 (b) Notwithstanding paragraph (a), during the first 90 consecutive days of employment, |
---|
15 | 15 | | 1.15an employer may pay an employee under the age of 20 years a wage of at least: |
---|
16 | 16 | | 1.16 (1) $6.50 $13.00 per hour beginning August 1, 2014 2025; |
---|
17 | 17 | | 1.17 (2) $7.25 $14.25 per hour beginning August 1, 2015 2026; |
---|
18 | 18 | | 1.18 (3) $7.75 $15.50 per hour beginning August 1, 2016 2027; and |
---|
19 | 19 | | 1.19 (4) $16.75 per hour beginning August 1, 2028; |
---|
20 | 20 | | 1Section 1. |
---|
21 | 21 | | 25-01644 as introduced01/02/25 REVISOR SS/HL |
---|
22 | 22 | | SENATE |
---|
23 | 23 | | STATE OF MINNESOTA |
---|
24 | 24 | | S.F. No. 671NINETY-FOURTH SESSION |
---|
25 | 25 | | (SENATE AUTHORS: MOHAMED and Oumou Verbeten) |
---|
26 | 26 | | OFFICIAL STATUSD-PGDATE |
---|
27 | 27 | | Introduction and first reading01/27/2025 |
---|
28 | 28 | | Referred to Labor 2.1 (5) $18.00 per hour beginning August 1, 2029; and |
---|
29 | 29 | | 2.2 (4) (6) the rate established under paragraph (c) beginning January 1, 2018 2030. |
---|
30 | 30 | | 2.3No employer may take any action to displace an employee, including a partial displacement |
---|
31 | 31 | | 2.4through a reduction in hours, wages, or employment benefits, in order to hire an employee |
---|
32 | 32 | | 2.5at the wage authorized in this paragraph. |
---|
33 | 33 | | 2.6 (c) No later than August 31 of each year, the commissioner shall determine the percentage |
---|
34 | 34 | | 2.7increase in the rate of inflation, as measured by the implicit price deflator, national data for |
---|
35 | 35 | | 2.8personal consumption expenditures as determined by the United States Department of |
---|
36 | 36 | | 2.9Commerce, Bureau of Economic Analysis during the 12-month period immediately preceding |
---|
37 | 37 | | 2.10that August or, if that data is unavailable, during the most recent 12-month period for which |
---|
38 | 38 | | 2.11data is available. The minimum wage rates in paragraphs (a) and (b) are increased by the |
---|
39 | 39 | | 2.12lesser of: (1) five percent, rounded to the nearest cent; or (2) the percentage calculated by |
---|
40 | 40 | | 2.13the commissioner, rounded to the nearest cent. A minimum wage rate shall not be reduced |
---|
41 | 41 | | 2.14under this paragraph. The new minimum wage rates determined under this paragraph take |
---|
42 | 42 | | 2.15effect on the next January 1. |
---|
43 | 43 | | 2Section 1. |
---|
44 | 44 | | 25-01644 as introduced01/02/25 REVISOR SS/HL |
---|