Minnesota 2025-2026 Regular Session

Minnesota Senate Bill SF671 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/24/2025

                            1.1	A bill for an act​
1.2 relating to labor; providing an increase to minimum wages; amending Minnesota​
1.3 Statutes 2024, section 177.24, subdivision 1.​
1.4BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF MINNESOTA:​
1.5 Section 1. Minnesota Statutes 2024, section 177.24, subdivision 1, is amended to read:​
1.6 Subdivision 1.Amount.(a) Except as otherwise provided in sections 177.21 to 177.35,​
1.7every employer must pay each employee wages at a rate of at least:​
1.8 (1) $8.00 $15.00 per hour beginning August 1, 2014 2025;​
1.9 (2) $9.00 $16.25 per hour beginning August 1, 2015 2026;​
1.10 (3) $9.50 $17.50 per hour beginning August 1, 2016 2027; and​
1.11 (4) $18.75 per hour beginning August 1, 2028;​
1.12 (5) $20.00 per hour beginning August 1, 2029; and​
1.13 (4) (6) the rate established under paragraph (c) beginning January 1, 2018 2030.​
1.14 (b) Notwithstanding paragraph (a), during the first 90 consecutive days of employment,​
1.15an employer may pay an employee under the age of 20 years a wage of at least:​
1.16 (1) $6.50 $13.00 per hour beginning August 1, 2014 2025;​
1.17 (2) $7.25 $14.25 per hour beginning August 1, 2015 2026;​
1.18 (3) $7.75 $15.50 per hour beginning August 1, 2016 2027; and​
1.19 (4) $16.75 per hour beginning August 1, 2028;​
1​Section 1.​
25-01644 as introduced​01/02/25 REVISOR SS/HL​
SENATE​
STATE OF MINNESOTA​
S.F. No. 671​NINETY-FOURTH SESSION​
(SENATE AUTHORS: MOHAMED and Oumou Verbeten)​
OFFICIAL STATUS​D-PG​DATE​
Introduction and first reading​01/27/2025​
Referred to Labor​ 2.1 (5) $18.00 per hour beginning August 1, 2029; and​
2.2 (4) (6) the rate established under paragraph (c) beginning January 1, 2018 2030.​
2.3No employer may take any action to displace an employee, including a partial displacement​
2.4through a reduction in hours, wages, or employment benefits, in order to hire an employee​
2.5at the wage authorized in this paragraph.​
2.6 (c) No later than August 31 of each year, the commissioner shall determine the percentage​
2.7increase in the rate of inflation, as measured by the implicit price deflator, national data for​
2.8personal consumption expenditures as determined by the United States Department of​
2.9Commerce, Bureau of Economic Analysis during the 12-month period immediately preceding​
2.10that August or, if that data is unavailable, during the most recent 12-month period for which​
2.11data is available. The minimum wage rates in paragraphs (a) and (b) are increased by the​
2.12lesser of: (1) five percent, rounded to the nearest cent; or (2) the percentage calculated by​
2.13the commissioner, rounded to the nearest cent. A minimum wage rate shall not be reduced​
2.14under this paragraph. The new minimum wage rates determined under this paragraph take​
2.15effect on the next January 1.​
2​Section 1.​
25-01644 as introduced​01/02/25 REVISOR SS/HL​