LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Missouri MO
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1481
Draft Versions
MO
Missouri House Bill HB1481
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Missouri 2022 Regular Session
Missouri House Bill HB1481
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Fiscal Note
February 23, 2022
Fiscal Note
January 6, 2022
Bill
December 1, 2021
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 23, 2022
Compare
Comm Sub
Analysis
February 23, 2022
Analysis
January 20, 2022
Analysis
December 3, 2021