Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1489 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 27, 2022
Fiscal Note January 26, 2022
Fiscal Note December 29, 2021
Bill December 1, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 29, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022
Bill January 26, 2022
Analysis December 3, 2021