Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2022
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Friday, May 6, 2022, 9:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2022
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2022
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 13, 2022, 10:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2022
|
Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 131 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Voted Do Pass - Consent (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Referred: Consent and House Procedure(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Referred: Local Government(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2021
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|