Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1541 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note May 5, 2022
Fiscal Note February 23, 2022
Fiscal Note December 29, 2021
Bill December 1, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 23, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill May 4, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis December 9, 2021