Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Second read and referred: Seniors, Families, Veterans and Military Affairs(S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 126 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Referred: Children and Families(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2021
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|