House | 04/05/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | Referred: Public Safety(H) | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2021 | Prefiled (H) |