Senate | 04/21/2022 | Second read and referred: General Laws(S) | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 131 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 5 | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | Perfected (H) | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | HCS Adopted (H) | ||
House | 04/13/2022 | Taken Up | ||
House | 04/06/2022 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/05/2022 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Laid Over (H) | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Title of Bill - Agreed To | ||
House | 03/23/2022 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Referred: Rural Community Development(H) | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/01/2021 | Prefiled (H) |