Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1696 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 13, 2022
Fiscal Note February 11, 2022
Fiscal Note January 24, 2022
Bill December 7, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 13, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 14, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022
Analysis December 17, 2021