Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1722 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 6, 2022
Fiscal Note February 11, 2022
Bill December 2, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis March 3, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022
Analysis December 20, 2021