Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 98 NOES: 48 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Action Postponed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Executive Session Continued
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/07/2021
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|