Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB1859 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 14, 2022
Fiscal Note January 6, 2022
Bill December 7, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 19, 2022
Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis December 29, 2021