Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Second read and referred: Education(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 95 NOES: 46 PRESENT: 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, adopted. AYES: 90 NOES: 42 PRESENT: 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To - AYES: 91 NOES: 47 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2022
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 19 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/15/2021
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|