House | 05/09/2022 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 05/05/2022 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/19/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 01/19/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Referred: Public Safety(H) | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/16/2021 | Prefiled (H) |