House | 05/09/2022 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 05/02/2022 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/29/2022 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/22/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/16/2021 | Prefiled (H) |