Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2008 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 1, 2022
Fiscal Note March 14, 2022
Bill December 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis March 30, 2022
Bill March 29, 2022
Analysis January 5, 2022