House | 05/09/2022 | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 04/28/2022 | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 20 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 02/23/2022 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Action Postponed (H) | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Executive Session Continued | ||
House | 02/08/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 12/16/2021 | Prefiled (H) |