Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2011 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 1, 2022
Fiscal Note February 2, 2022
Bill December 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Analysis February 25, 2022
Bill February 24, 2022
Analysis January 5, 2022