Senate
|
05/05/2022
|
Placed on Informal Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2022
|
Executive Session Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, May 4, 2022, 9:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 2.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2022
|
Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2022
|
SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2022
|
Public Hearing Held (S)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2022
|
Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 25, 2022, 2:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2022
|
Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 139 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2022
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Perfected (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Referred: Corrections and Public Institutions(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
12/23/2021
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|