Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2088 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 28, 2022
Fiscal Note March 29, 2022
Fiscal Note January 24, 2022
Bill December 23, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 29, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill April 27, 2022
Analysis April 1, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis January 7, 2022