House | 04/25/2022 | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) | ||
House | 04/25/2022 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | ||
House | 04/21/2022 | Executive Session Completed (H) | ||
House | 04/07/2022 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Referred: Rural Community Development(H) | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Read Second Time (H) | ||
House | 01/05/2022 | Read First Time (H) | ||
House | 01/04/2022 | Prefiled (H) |