Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2133 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 26, 2022
Fiscal Note April 5, 2022
Bill January 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 29, 2022
Bill April 25, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022