Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2138 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 23, 2022
Fiscal Note January 27, 2022
Bill January 4, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis February 25, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022