Senate
|
05/10/2022
|
Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 96 NOES: 47 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Taken Up for Third Reading (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2022
|
Executive Session Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2022
|
Referred: Fiscal Review(H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 1, as amended, HA 2, adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
HCS Adopted (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Title of Bill - Agreed To
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2022
|
Taken Up for Perfection (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2022
|
Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2022
|
Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Action Postponed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Executive Session Continued
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Public Hearing Completed (H)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Referred: Elections and Elected Officials(H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Read Second Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/05/2022
|
Read First Time (H)
|
|
|
House
|
01/04/2022
|
Prefiled (H)
|
|
|