Missouri 2022 Regular Session

Missouri House Bill HB2140 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note April 14, 2022
Fiscal Note March 9, 2022
Fiscal Note February 3, 2022
Bill January 4, 2022

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2022

Comm Sub

Analysis April 19, 2022
Analysis March 7, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022